open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01119
    Party Name:Velasquez v. NM Corporations Commission et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (when not to a motion)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438489
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =