open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01117
    Party Name:Cox v. Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438487
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =