open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01123
    Party Name:Charles Eby v. Peterson et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Notice of Docketing ROA]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:May 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:May 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed 28 U.S.C. 1915]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438580
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =