open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01151
    Party Name:Chavez v. Horton et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response (when not to a motion)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appendix/Supplement]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:March 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for 2254 Relief]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438951
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =