open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01150
    Party Name:Desert Fox Custom Restorations, Inc. v. CWS Marketing Group et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Initial Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Demand]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438950
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =