open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:2:19-cv-01149
    Party Name:Anderson et al v. City of Las Cruces et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438949
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =