open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:10-10297-t7
    Party Name:Donna Kay Mercer
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Notice of Error]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Possible Dividend (Notice)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Report of Assets]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Terminate Deadline]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Notice of Appointment and Designation of Required Bond]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Reopen Case Ch 7 (Order)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Add Judge]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Montoya, Philip J. [Reopen Case - Chapter 7 (Motion)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?125182
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =