open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:20-11324-j7
    Party Name:Marsha Ann Mayberry
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Entry of Appearance (Notice)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information on Requestor]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
    Date Published:July 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Receipt of Filing Fee (Manual Docketing)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Coll, Clarke C. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?168682
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =