open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:20-11589-t7
    Party Name:Marlene Martinez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds (341 filings)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Receipt of Installment Payment]
    Date Published:August 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Waived (Order on Application to Have Filing Fee)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Waived (Application to Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Certification/Statement Regarding Marital Status]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Set Case Flag to Pro Se]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mazel, Edward Alexander [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?168951
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =