open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico

NEW MEXICO PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of New Mexico
    Case Number:20-11593-t7
    Party Name:John J. Vary and Carolyn S. Vary
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Certification of Completion of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Set Judge Code Flag]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [none]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Credit Counseling Received: Certificates Submitted]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gonzales, Yvette J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (FEE)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.nmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?168955
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =