U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00701-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cobb et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 06, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Minute Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Discovery Order]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.