U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00880-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Armendariz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 17, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.