U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Estrada-Renteria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Minute Order]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Discovery Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.