U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cobos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • May 14, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • September 01, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 14, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2022: [In Limine]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 20, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • December 16, 2021: [Witness List]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 26, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 26, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.