U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01376-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.