U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01389-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of 2255 Filings (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Return of Exhibits]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Jury Notes]
  • June 09, 2022: [Court's Jury Instructions]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 02, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • May 31, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • May 31, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 31, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • May 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • May 26, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • May 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Suppress]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 30, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 23, 2022: [In Limine]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.