U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01386-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murguia-Villegas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.