U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01384-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marquez-Marquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2021: [Minute Order]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.