U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01382-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Caballero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 03, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Extend (other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.