U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01871-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jelks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.