U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01441-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Santillanes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Reply to Response]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Minute Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.