U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01622-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 10, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 17, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 11, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 24, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 24, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.