U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01626-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Vallejos, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 11, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 04, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.