U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01370-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Delgadillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 14, 2022: [Strike]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.