U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00564-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [Discovery Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.