U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01415-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probation/Supervised Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.