U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01427-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griego
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2022: [Release from Custody]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 13, 2022: [Revoke]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Discovery Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.