U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01423-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manning
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Discovery Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.