U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01422-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Discovery Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.