U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01421-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoogerhuies
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Discovery Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.