U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01419-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Begaye
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.