U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01428-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lien
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Reply to Response]
  • January 17, 2023: [Response in Opposition]
  • January 13, 2023: [Reconsideration]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2021: [Discovery Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.