U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00361-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trevino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 10, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.