U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01409-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Contreras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.