U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-01260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Munoz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.