U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01408-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez-Rosales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 27, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric/Psychological Treatment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Psychiatric/Psychological Treatment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.