U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01455-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Venzor-Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • July 19, 2022: [Oral Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.