U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01393-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buendia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 12, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.