U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01329-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 16, 2022: [Order]
  • October 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.