U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01464-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 07, 2022: [Release from Custody]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.