U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01463-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maxwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.