U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01460-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Del Angel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.