U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01466-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carlos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.