U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01499-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion (with Video Streaming)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Release from Custody]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extend (other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 27, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.