U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01509-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haywood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 18, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • April 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2021: [Minute Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.