U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01508-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.