U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01497-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marcos-Tomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Release from Custody]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.