U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01417-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quillman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.