U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01501-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Peshlakai
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 24, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extend (other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.