U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01336-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • May 02, 2025: [Minute Order]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.